NM HB48 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial driver's license retesting
Title
Commercial driver's license retesting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (59-4) |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | House | [LD 7] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | House | [LD 7] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |