NM HB48 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - [LD 15] DP-SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - [LD 15] DP-SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native american emergency medical services
Title
Native american emergency medical services
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Begaye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP-SFC API. | |
2010-01-29 | [LD 9] SIAC/SFC-SIAC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (62-0) | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] DP | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] DP-HAFC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HCPAC/HAFC-HCPAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=48&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/bills/house/HB0048.pdf |