NM HB469 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP - PASSED/S (35-0) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP - PASSED/S (35-0) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Technical violation of probation release
Title
Technical violation of probation release
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Chasey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP - PASSED/S (35-0) VETO. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] SJC | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (59-10) | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP-HCPAC | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] HJC/HCPAC-HJC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=469&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0469.pdf |