NM HB463 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (38-2) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 85.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (38-2) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 85.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Barber licensure after apprenticeship
Title
Barber licensure after apprenticeship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | [LD 48] Passed Senate (38-2) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 85. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (58-6) |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |