NM HB42 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Filing of annual land grant board reports
Title
Filing of annual land grant board reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 72. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (66-0) |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Voters & Elections |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Voters & Elections |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Printed |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |