NM HB369 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Informed consent for genetic testing
Title
Informed consent for genetic testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | [LD 48] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.156. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-27 | House | [LD 29] Passed House (60-0) |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-29 | House | [LD 8] HHC |
2015-01-29 | House | [LD 8] HHC and then to House Judiciary |