NM HB364 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 77 - Mar. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 77 - Mar. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcohol Delivery, Licenses & Ad Money
Title
Alcohol Delivery, Licenses & Ad Money
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Lane [R] | Rep. Doreen Gallegos [D] | Rep. Joshua Hernandez [R] | Rep. Art De La Cruz [D] |
Sen. Antonio Maestas [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 77 - Mar. 30 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:29 N:7 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:10 |
2023-02-25 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-17 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-02-09 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HJC |