NM HB36 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exemptions For Legal Action Against Property
Title
Exemptions For Legal Action Against Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2021-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2021-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-02-19 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-01-28 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC/HTRC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |