NM HB342 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 211 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 211 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Justice Reforms
Title
Criminal Justice Reforms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 211 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-02-24 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-02-21 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |