NM HB338 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Failed passage in House (31-34).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Failed passage in House (31-34).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Solar Gardens Act
Title
Community Solar Gardens Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Failed passage in House (31-34). |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HSIVC |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HSIVC and then to House Judiciary |