NM HB322 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 119 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 119 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Autism Spectrum Disorder Coverage
Title
Autism Spectrum Disorder Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 119 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-03-08 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC |
2019-02-22 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:50 N:14 |
2019-02-20 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-08 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HHHC |