NM HB31 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
New Mexico Private Equity Fund Definition
Title
New Mexico Private Equity Fund Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Passed House (60-0) |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Ways & Means |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Business & Employment |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Business & Employment and then to House Ways & Means |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |