NM HB31 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - [LD 32] (Succeeding entries: H 349).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - [LD 32] (Succeeding entries: H 349).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dwi convictions for sentencing
Title
Dwi convictions for sentencing
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Lewis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] (Succeeding entries: H 349). |
2013-02-22 | House | [LD 29] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-22 | House | [LD 29] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2013-01-15 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=31&year=13 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/13%20Regular/bills/house/HB0031.pdf |