NM HB292 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 36 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prescription Drug Cost Sharing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Cost Sharing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 36 - Mar. 4
2020-02-20SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:40 N:1
2020-02-18SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-15SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC
2020-02-14HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:2
2020-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2020-02-11HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-06HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-30HouseReferred to: HHHC/HSEIC
2020-01-30HousePrinted
2020-01-30HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2020-01-29HouseNot Printed

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback