NM HB287 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Access To Culturally Appropriate Svcs.
Title
Access To Culturally Appropriate Svcs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:1 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2021-03-15 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2021-03-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2021-03-04 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-03-01 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-16 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |