NM HB273 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] SPAC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] SPAC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hospital districts as public employees
Title
Hospital districts as public employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] SPAC API. | |
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (56-4) | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP | |
2010-02-03 | [LD 12] w/drn - prntd- ref HHGAC-HHGAC | |
2010-02-02 | [LD 11] not prntd-HRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=273&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/bills/house/HB0273.pdf |