NM HB272 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-14 - SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-14 - SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Easy Enrollment Program
Title
Health Easy Enrollment Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:18 |
2021-03-05 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-01 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-09 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HTRC |