NM HB269 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Educational retirement contribution increase
Title
Educational retirement contribution increase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed House (66-2) | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to House Education | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Assigned to House Education | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Printed | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Not Printed |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=269&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/house/HB0269.pdf |