NM HB263 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-16 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-16 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Probation & Parole Clarification
Title
Probation & Parole Clarification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-16 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-16 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2020-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:47 N:17 |
2020-02-13 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to: HJC |
2020-01-30 | House | Printed |
2020-01-30 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2020-01-28 | House | Not Printed |