NM HB26 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-10 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-10 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class A County Hospitals Indigent Reporting
Title
Class A County Hospitals Indigent Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (58-5) |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] HLELC |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] HHouse Health |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to HHouse Health and then to HLELC |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |