NM HB245 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance purchasing cooperative
Title
Health insurance purchasing cooperative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] SFC API. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (66-0) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DNP-CS/DP-HBIC | |
2011-01-26 | [LD 9] HHGAC/HBIC/HJC-HHGAC |