NM HB197 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] DP - PASSED/S (28-6) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] DP - PASSED/S (28-6) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Severance fund investment in renewable energy
Title
Severance fund investment in renewable energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP - PASSED/S (28-6) POCKET VETO. | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SFC | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP - PASSED/H (63-0) | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP/a-HAFC | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] HTRC/HAFC-HTRC |