NM HB15 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Data Breach Notification Act
Title
Data Breach Notification Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 36 |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] h and then to cncrd |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | [LD 29] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (68-0) |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |