NM HB146 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Wnmu rural economic development institute

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wnmu rural economic development institute

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-07 [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
2012-02-07 [LD 16] Referred to Senate Finance
2012-02-07 [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-02-02 [LD 13] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2012-02-02 [LD 13] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance
2012-02-08 [LD 17] Passed House (66-0)
2012-02-08 [LD 17] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2012-01-30 [LD 10] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
2012-01-30 [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-01-19 [LD 3] Referred to House Health & Government Affairs
2012-01-19 [LD 3] Assigned to House Health & Government Affairs and then to House Appropriations & Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback