NM HB118 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - [LD 35] DP-SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - [LD 35] DP-SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Threshold for audits of nonprofits
Title
Threshold for audits of nonprofits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SJC API. | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] SPAC/SJC-SPAC | |
2011-02-10 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (60-0) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP | |
2011-01-31 | [LD 14] DP-HJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HHGAC/HJC-HHGAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=118&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0118.pdf |