NM HB112 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Carlsbad Brine Well Remediation
Title
Carlsbad Brine Well Remediation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (66-0) |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Assigned to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife and then to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |