NM HB111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Land Grant-merced Assistance Fund
Title
Land Grant-merced Assistance Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:51 N:13 |
2020-02-08 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee without a recommendation |
2020-01-30 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-22 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HAFC |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |