NM HB102 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Health Scope Of Practice Committee
Title
Health Scope Of Practice Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Passed House (62-1) |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Health |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Health and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |