NJ SJR42 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR59
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR74
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR127
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR74
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November of each year as "Diabetes and Cardiovascular Disease Awareness Month."
Title
Designates November of each year as "Diabetes and Cardiovascular Disease Awareness Month."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR42 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR74 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR127 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
AJR118 (Same As) 2022-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR74 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR127 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
AJR118 (Same As) 2022-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SJR42 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SJR/42_I1.HTM |