NJ SJR37 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR65
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR70
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR99
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR70
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR99
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates second Tuesday in April as "Equal Pay Day."
Title
Designates second Tuesday in April as "Equal Pay Day."
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR37 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR37 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR52 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR99 (Carry Over) 2016-05-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
SJR37 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR52 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR99 (Carry Over) 2016-05-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR37 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/37_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR37 |