NJ SJR36 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR28
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-23.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-23.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October of each year as "Pregnancy and Infant Loss Remembrance Month" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates October of each year as "Pregnancy and Infant Loss Remembrance Month" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR84 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR-23. |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR84 |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR28 (Carry Over) 2016-09-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR84 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by SJR36
AJR84 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by SJR36
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR36 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/36_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR36 |