NJ SJR12 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR105
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR127
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR248
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR80
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR203
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR127
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR248
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR80
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR203
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Cybersecurity Task Force."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Cybersecurity Task Force."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR12 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
SJR127 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AJR248 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
AJR66 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
SJR80 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR203 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR127 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AJR248 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
AJR66 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
SJR80 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR203 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SJR12 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SJR/12_I1.HTM |