NJ AJR203 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR12
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR123
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR197
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR123
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR197
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May 23 each year as "Renewable Energy Day" in NJ.
Title
Designates May 23 each year as "Renewable Energy Day" in NJ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR203 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR52 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SJR123 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
AJR197 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
SJR52 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SJR123 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
AJR197 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AJR203 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AJR/203_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR203 |