NJ SJR109 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by AJR149 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by AJR149 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses State's support for addressing homelessness through rapid rehousing strategies and urges use of rapid rehousing core components by community-based programs.
Title
Expresses State's support for addressing homelessness through rapid rehousing strategies and urges use of rapid rehousing core components by community-based programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Senate | Substituted by AJR149 (2R) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR149 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-24.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/SJR109 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/SJR/109_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR109 |