NJ S864 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2776

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-04 - Approved P.L.2020, c.117.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits provision or sale of single-use plastic carryout bags, single-use paper carryout bags, and polystyrene foam food service products; limits provision of single-use plastic straws; appropriates moneys from Clean Communities Program Fund for public education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits provision or sale of single-use plastic carryout bags, single-use paper carryout bags, and polystyrene foam food service products; limits provision of single-use plastic straws; appropriates moneys from Clean Communities Program Fund for public education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1978 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-04SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.117.
2020-09-24SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-13)
2020-09-24SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (47-24-7)
2020-09-24AssemblySubstituted for A1978 (ACS/1R)
2020-09-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-09-21AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
2020-09-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-09-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2020-03-05SenatePassed by the Senate (22-14)
2020-02-10SenateSenate Amendment (22-2) (Smith)
2020-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2776 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A1978 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S864 (4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback