NJ S2776 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits provision or sale of single-use plastic carryout bags, single-use paper carryout bags, and polystyrene foam food service products; limits provision of single-use plastic straws; appropriates moneys from Clean Communities Program Fund for public education. ***

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits provision or sale of single-use plastic carryout bags, single-use paper carryout bags, and polystyrene foam food service products; limits provision of single-use plastic straws; appropriates moneys from Clean Communities Program Fund for public education. ***

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2020-01-13SenatePassed by the Senate (21-14)
2020-01-09SenateSenate Amendment (22-0) (Smith)
2019-12-05SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-09-27SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-09-27SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4330 (Same As) 2018-07-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback