CA SB1420 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Set for hearing April 22.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Set for hearing April 22.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 43869.5 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 21189.81, 25545, and 25741 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Hydrogen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3468.) (April 3). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and E., U. & C. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43869.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25741 | Amended Code | Citation Text |