NJ S858 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A876
Note: Carry Foward to future S2345
Note: Carry Over of previous S3038
Note: Carry Foward to future S2345
Note: Carry Over of previous S3038
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidates certain affordable housing and assistance applications.
Title
Consolidates certain affordable housing and assistance applications.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Renee Burgess [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-01 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S858 (Carry Over) 2022-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S858 (Carry Over) 2022-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3038 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2760 (Same As) 2023-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S858 (Carry Over) 2022-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3038 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2760 (Same As) 2023-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee