NJ S3038 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S858
Note: Carry Foward to future A2760
Note: Carry Foward to future A2760
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidates certain affordable housing and assistance applications.
Title
Consolidates certain affordable housing and assistance applications.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3038 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3038 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A4734 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3038 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A4734 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee