NJ S816 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1741
Note: Carry Over of previous A518
Note: Carry Over of previous A518
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands purpose of Traumatic Brain Injury Fund to support transportation costs incurred by eligible individuals in accessing support group meetings.
Title
Expands purpose of Traumatic Brain Injury Fund to support transportation costs incurred by eligible individuals in accessing support group meetings.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Owen Henry [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1741 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A518 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3780 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A518 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3780 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S816 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1000/816_I1.HTM |