NJ S808 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2932
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes framework for cybersecurity information sharing and preparedness; creates NJ Cybersecurity Advisory Board. *
Title
Establishes framework for cybersecurity information sharing and preparedness; creates NJ Cybersecurity Advisory Board. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2932 (Carry Over) 2015-10-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2265 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2265 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S808 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/808_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S808 |