NJ S761 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S895
Note: Carryover of previous S895

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Earn Your Way Out Act"; requires DOC to develop inmate reentry plan and establish information database; establishes administrative parole release and provides compliance credits.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Earn Your Way Out Act"; requires DOC to develop inmate reentry plan and establish information database; establishes administrative parole release and provides compliance credits.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1986 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-05SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-11-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (55-16-3)
2019-11-25AssemblySubstituted for A1986 (2R)
2019-11-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (27-11)
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-08SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S895 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S895 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1986 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S761 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback