NJ S895 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Earn Your Way Out Act" ; requires DOC to develop inmate reentry plan; establishes administrative parole release for certain inmates;requires study and report by DOC on fiscal impact.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Earn Your Way Out Act" ; requires DOC to develop inmate reentry plan; establishes administrative parole release for certain inmates;requires study and report by DOC on fiscal impact.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2182 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2017-02-15AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (44-26-0)
2017-02-15AssemblySubstituted for A2182 (ACS)
2017-01-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-12-05AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-11-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2016-11-14SenatePassed by the Senate (24-11)
2016-10-20SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Lesniak)
2016-09-26SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-07-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-07-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-07-14SenateTransferred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2182 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S895 (SCS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback