NJ A2182 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S895 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

"Earn Your Way Out Act" ; requires DOC to develop inmate reentry plan; establishes administrative parole release for certain inmates;requires study and report by DOC on fiscal impact.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Earn Your Way Out Act" ; requires DOC to develop inmate reentry plan; establishes administrative parole release for certain inmates;requires study and report by DOC on fiscal impact.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15AssemblySubstituted by S895 (SCS/1R)
2017-01-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-12-05AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S895 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback