NJ A1986 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2182

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S761 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Earn Your Way Out Act"; requires DOC to develop inmate reentry plan and establish information database; establishes administrative parole release and provides compliance credits.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Earn Your Way Out Act"; requires DOC to develop inmate reentry plan and establish information database; establishes administrative parole release and provides compliance credits.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25AssemblySubstituted by S761 (3R)
2019-11-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2182 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S895 (SCS/1R)
S761 (Same As) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.364.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback