NJ S731 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1178
Note: Carry Foward to future S2368
Note: Carry Over of previous S3815
Note: Carry Over of previous A5761
Note: Carry Foward to future S2368
Note: Carry Over of previous S3815
Note: Carry Over of previous A5761
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires feasibility study to examine establishment of regional medical examiner office facility in Southern New Jersey and collaborative development of new medical examiner education initiatives; appropriates $40,000.
Title
Requires feasibility study to examine establishment of regional medical examiner office facility in Southern New Jersey and collaborative development of new medical examiner education initiatives; appropriates $40,000.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S731 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S731 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3815 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5761 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2567 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S731 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3815 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5761 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2567 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S731 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/731_I2.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/731_I1.HTM |