NJ A2567 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1178
Note: Carry Foward to future S2368
Note: Carry Over of previous A5761
Note: Carry Over of previous S3815
Note: Carry Foward to future S2368
Note: Carry Over of previous A5761
Note: Carry Over of previous S3815
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires feasibility study to examine establishment of regional medical examiner office facility in Southern New Jersey and collaborative development of new medical examiner education initiatives; appropriates $40,000.
Title
Requires feasibility study to examine establishment of regional medical examiner office facility in Southern New Jersey and collaborative development of new medical examiner education initiatives; appropriates $40,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2567 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2567 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S731 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5761 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3815 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2567 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S731 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5761 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3815 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2567 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2567_I1.HTM |