NJ S730 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S638
Note: Carry Foward to future A3138
Note: Carry Over of previous S3419
Note: Carry Foward to future A3138
Note: Carry Over of previous S3419
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes special license plates for honorably discharged veterans.
Title
Establishes special license plates for honorably discharged veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S730 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S730 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3419 (Carry Over) 2017-07-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A133 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S730 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3419 (Carry Over) 2017-07-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A133 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S730 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/730_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S730 |