NJ A3138 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1878
Note: Carry Over of previous S730
Note: Carry Over of previous A133
Note: Carry Over of previous S730
Note: Carry Over of previous A133
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes special license plates for honorably discharged veterans.
Title
Establishes special license plates for honorably discharged veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3138 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S638 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S730 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A133 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S638 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S730 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A133 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3138 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3138_I1.HTM |