NJ S652 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3011
Note: Carry Over of previous S1416
Note: Carry Over of previous A139
Note: Carry Over of previous S1416
Note: Carry Over of previous A139
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits governing body of municipalities having population of 30,000 or less to serve as local board of health; validates certain actions.
Title
Permits governing body of municipalities having population of 30,000 or less to serve as local board of health; validates certain actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A117 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A117 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2023, c.205. |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A117 |
2023-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S652 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.205.
S1416 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A139 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A117 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S652
S1416 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A139 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A117 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S652